U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-63504-tmr7
  • Case Name: John David Bonander
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 13, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • February 10, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Discharging Debtor(s) - DC7]
  • February 10, 2016: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2015
  • December 13, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • October 21, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents]
  • October 21, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Notice of Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 07/13]
  • October 21, 2015: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pancic, Vanesa [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.