Court Name: | U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island |
Case Number: | 1:15-cv-00496 |
Party Name: | Passaretta v. Litton Loan Servicing, LP et al |
Filing Type: | Civil [Letter] |
Date Published: | September 13, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Order] |
Date Published: | January 26, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Stipulation] |
Date Published: | January 25, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [In Chambers Conference] |
Date Published: | January 25, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Notice of Hearing] |
Date Published: | January 08, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal] |
Date Published: | January 04, 2016 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Dismiss for failure to State a Claim] |
Date Published: | December 02, 2015 |
Filing Type: | Civil [State Court Record] |
Date Published: | December 02, 2015 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned] |
Date Published: | November 25, 2015 |
Filing Type: | Civil [Notice of Removal - New Case] |
Date Published: | November 25, 2015 |