U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Texas

texas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Texas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-30928-bjh13
  • Case Name: Janet Vaughn Bashaw
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Approving chapter 13 trustee report and discharging trustee]
July, 2016
  • July 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document]
  • July 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Chapter 13 trustee's final report and account]
  • July 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Final report summary (batch)]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [AutoClose bankruptcy case]
  • May 01, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Dismiss case]
  • April 01, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Notice of intent to dismiss case]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Notice of change of address]
May, 2015
  • May 07, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Powers, Thomas [Notice of appearance and request for notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.