U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

texas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Texas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-34872
  • Case Name: Stanislaw Raymund Burzynski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors)]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 09, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case]
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Objection]
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Witness List]
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice]
  • November 04, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Compel]
  • November 01, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Response]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice]
  • October 14, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Summons - Request for Issuance]
  • September 17, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists]
  • September 16, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 16, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.