open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:16-80065-
    Party Name:Tower Loan of Cullman v. Hampton
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?634385
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =