open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00004-
    Party Name:Tower Loan of Cullman v. Pair
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve Compromise]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve Compromise - Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Trial Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Document Production]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640438
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =