open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00009-
    Party Name:Murrell v. Anesthesia Services of Birmingham, PC
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 16, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640841
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =