open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00020-
    Party Name:Bell et al v. Anesthesia Services of Birmingham, P.C.
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice and Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Approve Compromise - Motion]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?641719
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =