open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:18-80005-
    Party Name:Tower Loan of Cullman v. Perkins
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Consent Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Report to Court]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Exhibit and Witness List]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Order and Notice of Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: Trustee: Thompson, Judith [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 8 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?655232
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =