open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00887
    Party Name:Lietzke v. City of Birmingham et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66714
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =