Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00047-1
    Party Name:USA v. Dawsey
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68653
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =