Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00014-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gonzalez-Esquivel
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65632
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =