Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00014-4
    Party Name:USA v. Faircloth et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before M/J]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adopt Motion]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue-Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Referred]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64096
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =