Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00063
    Party Name:ContainerPort Group, Inc. v. Law et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction Hearing]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64152
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =