open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00152-1
    Party Name:USA v. Barbu
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce ]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce ]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Referred]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Needed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64873
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =