open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00302-1
    Party Name:USA v. Welburn
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70316
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =