open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00524
    Party Name:Jackson v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief - Plaintiff]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Answer Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees (EAJA)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript (Social Security)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer (Social Security)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Waive Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Social Security Hearing]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA (Social Security Action)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65253
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =