open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00935
    Party Name:Diamond v. Alabama Department of Labor
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65934
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =