open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-33563
    Party Name:Roy Sanders and Patsy Sanders
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service Order on Rule 9007 Motion]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Rule 9007-1 Motion]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service - Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Amended Schedules/Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Clerk's Notice of Requirement to file Financial Management Certification]
    Date Published:March 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled or Continued]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Installment Payment All Chapters]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service - Order Approving Payment of Filing Fee Installments]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [BNC Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 13]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Employee Income Records/ Payment Advices for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Employee Income Records/ Payment Advices for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records/ Payment Advices for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records/ Payment Advices for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McKinney, Sabrina L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?236396
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =