open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-42036-7
    Party Name:Shianna Andrews
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security-Form B121]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?681256
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =