open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-14266
    Party Name:Kristina Kay Green
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Post 09/01/18)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Final Plan Summary]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Financial Management Course Due (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Trustee's Recommendation for Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Transmittal of FULL Filing Fees from Trustee]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chp 13]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Form B121 - Social Security Number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?150127
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =