open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00088
    Party Name:Barlow v. Billy et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to PSU Screening]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66502
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =