open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:20-11965
    Party Name:Mark Chesley Heathcock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Rescheduled 341 Meeting of Creditors & Conf Hrg for Ch 13]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Filing Error - No Action Taken by Court]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Wage Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto Assignment)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Order to Pay Wages]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Retired - Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Wage Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?152626
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =