open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:20-11963
    Party Name:William David Maag, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Andrews, Lynn Harwell [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - NO FUNDS]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Andrews, Lynn Harwell [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Andrews, Lynn Harwell [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (Auto Assignment)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Andrews, Lynn Harwell [Retired - Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Andrews, Lynn Harwell [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?152624
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =