open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00460
    Party Name:Norton v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
    Date Published:October 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Staff Notes]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67300
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =