open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:20-71159-13
    Party Name:Anthony L. Whitehead
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Matrix Filed]
    Date Published:October 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Telephonic Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice to File Matrix]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Social Security-Form B121]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Case Upload (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?690332
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =