open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:20-12399
    Party Name:Rodney Lynn McCroy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Objection to Claim (Set for Hearing)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Request for Wage Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Wage Order]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Filing Error - No Action Taken by Court]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto Assignment)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Wage Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?153124
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =