U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Preliminary Examination]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.