U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00037-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Document Referred]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Preliminary Examination]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 08, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Preliminary Examination]
  • March 08, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.