U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ammons
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Preliminary Examination]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Detain]
  • April 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2021: [In Camera Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.