U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • January 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2023: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.