U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 17, 2023: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • October 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 10, 2023: [Order]
  • July 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 29, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 10, 2023: [Order]
  • March 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Oral Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 06, 2022: [Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.