U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Topin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Subpoena]
  • April 08, 2025: [Subpoena]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 02, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • December 01, 2022: [Motions Referred]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • November 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2022: [Detain]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.