U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tillman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • December 13, 2022: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order for Repayment of CJA Attorney Fees]
  • November 30, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.