U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. French
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detain]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.