U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vallejo-Devora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detain]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.