U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00319-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 17, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
June, 2023
  • June 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2023: [Order]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • April 19, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • April 05, 2023: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2023
  • March 03, 2023: [Quash]
  • March 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Suppress]
  • January 12, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.