U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Reduce Sentence]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Per Curiam Opinion]
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
December, 2023
  • December 29, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 12, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • November 29, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2023
  • October 02, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2023
  • September 05, 2023: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
August, 2023
  • August 23, 2023: [Jury Selection]
  • August 20, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • August 18, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2023: [In Limine]
  • August 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2023: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • August 04, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Continue Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 29, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • January 20, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.