U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 05, 2023: [Document Referred]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Factual Resume]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order for Repayment of CJA Attorney Fees]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detain]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.