U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2023: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detain]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.