U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moffett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Information - Felony]
  • January 20, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 13, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Suppress]
  • December 12, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detain]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.