U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Dismiss ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detain]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.