U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detain]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.