U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.