U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00354-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 04, 2023: [Order]
  • August 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2023
  • March 16, 2023: [Order]
  • March 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.