U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00357-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2023: [Transcript]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
September, 2023
  • September 28, 2023: [Jury Trial]
  • September 28, 2023: [Jury Verdict ]
  • September 28, 2023: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • September 18, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 11, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 08, 2023: [Order]
  • September 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 21, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • May 15, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • May 15, 2023: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2023: [Continue Trial]
March, 2023
  • March 30, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • March 30, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.