U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 17, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2023
  • October 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2023
  • August 14, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
May, 2023
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.