U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00367-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOFTLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [xPO - Modify Conditions of Supervision]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • January 17, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 10, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 09, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
August, 2023
  • August 14, 2023: [Order]
  • August 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2023
  • March 13, 2023: [Order]
  • March 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.