U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Order]
  • December 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Continue Trial]
October, 2023
  • October 13, 2023: [Order]
  • October 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
June, 2023
  • June 09, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2023: [Continue Trial]
May, 2023
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 28, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2023: [Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.