U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00355-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 13, 2023: [Order]
June, 2023
  • June 29, 2023: [Judgment]
May, 2023
  • May 19, 2023: [Order]
  • May 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
March, 2023
  • March 01, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 01, 2023: [Order]
  • March 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 09, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.